Trustees THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST

Charity number: 801395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Maurel Chair 07 August 2017
None on record
Charles Austen Richardson Trustee 16 July 2022
None on record
Zoe Stewart-Field Trustee 26 November 2021
None on record
Ema Ojiako Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Franciane Husbands-Chevot Trustee 11 December 2020
None on record
Chi Evi-Parker Trustee 11 December 2020
None on record
Joanne Powell Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Sherida Bevan Trustee 16 November 2019
None on record
Peter John Cameron Brown Trustee 13 October 2018
None on record
Sarah Louise Brown Trustee 04 November 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST EDMUND, ROUNDHAY
Received: On time
Elaine Sharon Lambe Trustee 04 November 2017
None on record
David James Shanks Trustee 07 August 2017
None on record