Trustees MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1164703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Goodchild | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Marie Shenton | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Miller | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Bruce Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
James M Long | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID SOUTHERN | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Simon Morris Fellerman | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN PHILIP GRAHAM MBE | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Clive Lewis Emerson | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
HOWARD GERALD WILSON | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER GEOFFREY JOHN HEAD | Trustee | 27 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.