THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £732.81m £724.22m £727.48m £713.35m £742.14m
Total expenditure £601.17m £695.47m £973.69m £635.37m £690.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £731.51m £494.16m N/A £486.91m £492.13m
Income - Donations and legacies £731.57m £10.00k £0 £487.07m £492.13m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £46.00k £693.00k £501.00k £777.00k £735.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.20m £781.00k £733.00k £1.39m £1.35m
Income - Other £0 £722.73m £726.25m £224.12m £248.92m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £156.00k £76.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £601.17m £662.61m £973.69m £635.37m £690.40m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £982.51k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £566.07m £662.61m £0 £588.05m £642.62m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £32.86m £0 £0 £0