CARDIFF UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1136855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £511.75m £505.12m £517.69m £538.50m £568.81m
Total expenditure £485.62m £516.74m £540.49m £644.83m £499.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £60.39m £46.42m £44.33m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £113.31m £131.69m £165.05m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £1.57m £2.57m £784.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £61.78m £62.72m £58.62m
Income - Charitable activities £506.02m £497.68m £440.72m £459.02m £497.24m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £403.00k £166.00k
Income - Investment £5.13m £7.45m £7.83m £6.26m £5.91m
Income - Other £601.00k £0 £5.79m £7.94m £6.27m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £485.62m £516.74m £455.42m £458.61m £465.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £2.27m £2.58m £2.55m
Expenditure - Governance £76.00k £80.00k £1.47m £1.51m £1.80m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £2.83m £2.94m £2.89m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £692.00k £925.00k £1.03m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £82.79m £183.65m £31.36m