NUFFIELD HEALTH

Charity number: 205533
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Income from government contracts N/A £136,100,000 £0 £109,479,000 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Other income £711,100,000 £631,500,000 £839,600,000 £800,021,000 £946,200,000
Total expenditure £708,300,000 £771,500,000 £837,000,000 £933,300,000 £953,700,000