SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1076822
Charity reporting is up to date

Governing document

Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.

MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2012

Charitable objects

THE OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1 - TO PROMOTE THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN (AS DEFINED IN ARTICLE 4.2); 1.2 - TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING OF CHILDREN; 1.3 - TO PRESERVE LIFE, AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELFARE, OF CHILDREN INCLUDING BY PROTECTING CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED HARM OR WHOSE LIVES AND SECURITY ARE AT RISK; 1.4 - TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN; AND 1.5 - TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES WHO ARE MEMBERS OF SAVE THE CHILDREN, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, CO-ORDINATION, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, IN ALL CASES WORKING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. 2 - IN THESE OBJECTS THE "HUMAN RIGHTS" OF CHILDREN MEANS ANY OR ALL OF THOSE RIGHTS AND FREEDOMS AS DEFINED IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE UNITED NATIONS CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD, INCLUDING THE RIGHTS TO SURVIVAL, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND PARTICIPATION, AND WILL BE PROMOTED IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 - ADVANCING UNDERSTANDING AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN; 2.2 - ENABLING CHILDREN TO ACHIEVE THEIR HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.3 - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN; 2.4 - PROMOTING RESPECT FOR THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN; AND 2.5 - CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW IN SO FAR AS IT APPLIES TO CHILDREN.

Area of benefit

The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.

WORLDWIDE