THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1036733
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Murdoch Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
TESSA SARAH ROSS Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
David Joseph Trustee 20 January 2014
RAYS OF SUNSHINE Charity reporting is up to date
THE GRENFELL FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Dr VERONICA TANYA MARIE BROWN Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
Ruth Mackenzie Trustee 01 July 2018
THE SERPENTINE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Daudi George Mpanga Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
Ciara Eastell Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
SIR NICHOLAS ANDREW SEROTA Chair 01 February 2017 None on record
KATHRYN CHARLOTTE LOUISE WILLARD Trustee 01 December 2017
INTERNATIONAL THEATRE EXCHANGE Charity reporting is up to date
Helen Birchenough Trustee 05 December 2018 None on record
Andrew James Miller Trustee 01 December 2017
WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU Charity reporting is up to date
DAVID PAUL ROBERTS Trustee 01 December 2017 None on record
SUKHBINDER SINGH JOHAL Trustee 01 December 2017
BLACK ENVIRONMENT NETWORK Charity reporting is 665 days late
Catherine Mallyon Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
Michael Eakin Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record