THE NATIONAL TRUST FOR PLACES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR NATURAL BEAUTY

Charity number: 205846
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Eynon Smart Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Ade Rawcliffe Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
MICHAEL DAY Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Dr Thomas Ernest Tew Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
DAVID FURSDON Trustee 01 September 2016
DEVON COUNTY AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION On time
Orna NiChionna Trustee 20 December 2013
SIR JOHN SOANE'S MUSEUM On time
ZARIN PATEL Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
TIMOTHY CHARLES PARKER Chair 08 November 2014
THE GRANGE FESTIVAL On time
THE BRAND FOUNDATION On time
ROYAL ACADEMY OF MUSIC On time
Sandy Nairne CBE FSA Trustee 02 April 2015 None on record
CAROLINE KAY Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Dr Aideen McGinley OBE Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
JOHN SELL CBE Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
NICK STACE Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record