CARDIFF UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1136855
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Taylor Doe Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
John Charles Shakeshaft Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Janet Coulson Juillerat Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
DR Janet Helen Wademan Trustee 28 November 2016 None on record
DR Steven John LUKE Trustee 01 August 2015 None on record
Professor Stuart Beaumont Palmer Chair 24 February 2014
The Institute of Physics Benevolent Fund On time
PROFESSOR COLIN BRYAN RIORDAN Trustee 01 October 2012
THE CONVERSATION TRUST (UK) LIMITED On time
EDGE FOUNDATION On time
Agnes Xavier-Phillips Trustee 14 May 2018
FFIN DANCE On time
Professor Dame Janet Valerie Finch Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Professor Rudolf Allemann Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
David John Simmons Trustee 01 August 2019 None on record
Paul Baston Trustee 04 December 2017 None on record
Dr CAROL BELL Trustee 01 July 2014
WALES MILLENNIUM CENTRE On time
MUSEUM OF LONDON ARCHAEOLOGY On time
THE INSTITUTE FOR ARCHAEO-METALLURGICAL STUDIES On time
THE BRITISH SCHOOL AT ATHENS On time
NATIONAL MUSEUM OF WALES On time
THE RENEWABLE ENERGY FOUNDATION On time
WELSH SINGERS SHOWCASE On time
JUDGE RAY SINGH MBE Trustee 01 August 2016
RACE COUNCIL CYMRU On time
MICHAEL DAVID HAMPSON Trustee 09 July 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR KAREN MARGARET HOLFORD Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record
ALASTAIR RONALD GIBBONS Trustee 01 July 2014 None on record
Tomos Ifan Evans Trustee 01 July 2019
CARDIFF UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION On time
Judith Anne Fabian Trustee 27 November 2018 None on record
Professor Kim Graham Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
Ricardo Leao Calil Trustee 21 August 2019 None on record
Len Richards Trustee 20 March 2018
IMPROVING CHANCES FOR UGANDA On time
Kenneth Lawrie Hamilton Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record