ACE YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1120282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 January 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 January 2020 92 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 November 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 November 2017 2 days late Download