AVENUE ST ANDREW'S SOUTHAMPTON UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download