Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF PERSHORE HOSPITAL

Charity number: 502273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required