Accounts and annual returns THE SIGNAL BOX CENTRE

Charity number: 1163454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 13 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window