THE ROYAL SOUTHAMPTON YACHT CLUB TRUST (RSYCT)

Charity number: 1164006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 May 2017 On time Download