Accounts and annual returns LOVE YOUR COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1172625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 September 2020 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 September 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 19 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window