Dogfen lywodraethu LIFEARC
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 MAR 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 OCT 1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 DEC 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUN 2017 as amended on 16 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY IMPROVING HUMAN HEALTH AND MEDICAL RESEARCH IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE PROGRESS OF THE SCIENTIFIC DISCOVERIES AND NEW TECHNOLOGIES ARISING FROM RESEARCH INTO THERAPEUTIC TREATMENTS, DRUGS, DIAGNOSTICS, OTHER TECHNOLOGIES OR INFORMATION RESOURCES. TO WORK WITH INDUSTRY, CHARITIES, UNIVERSITIES, THE HEALTH SERVICE AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES AS WELL AS CONDUCTING ITS OWN RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT AS NEEDED TO ACCELERATE THE PROGRESS OF THESE DISCOVERIES AND TECHNOLOGIES TO THE STAGE AT WHICH THEY ARE (I) CAPABLE OF BEING MADE GENERALLY AVAILABLE TO THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE PUBLIC FOR PRACTICAL APPLICATION FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF HEALTH AND/OR (II) ARE TRANSFERRED OR LICENSED TO A THIRD PARTY TO PROGRESS DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH DISCOVERIES OR TECHNOLOGIES TOWARDS SUCH GOALS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.