Trustees SAVE THE CHILDREN INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1076822

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Jean Ahrendts | Chair | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Thomas George WINTER | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anne Gates | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Lars Johan Heikensten | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Teresa Mbagaya | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Morolake Akinkugbe | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Larry Kamener | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Deepak Kapoor | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Jon Karleiv Andreas Lomoy | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Ann McGetrick | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Claudio Tesauro | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Patrick Henry Good | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Debra Fine | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Roy Leonard Caple Hernandez | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Bradley Chapman Irwin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Fahy | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Lule | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.