THE CHARITIES AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 268369
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 31 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 11 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 18 August 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 18 August 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)