SIR THOMAS WHITE'S NORTHAMPTON CHARITY

Charity number: 201486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURES DATED 1 JANUARY 1755 AND 2 JANUARY 1755. SCHEMES OF 4 FEBRUARY 1879 AND 30 JULY 1915 AS AMENDED ON 16 JANUARY 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
CLOTHING FOR POOR FREEMEN OF THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON
Registration history
  • 12 June 1962 : Standard registration
  • 01 December 2011 : Removed
  • 01 December 2011 : Asset transfer out