Shantona Women's & Family Centre Ltd.

Charity number: 1075752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download