IPSWICH AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE CIO

Charity number: 1159595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 23 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download