SALTFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 21 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 24 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 14 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download